NE LB549 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for creation and maintenance of a geographic information system map as prescribed under the Nebraska Telecommunications Regulation Act
Title
Provide for creation and maintenance of a geographic information system map as prescribed under the Nebraska Telecommunications Regulation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brandt [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 04, 2019 |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37700 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB549.pdf |