NE LB546 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide requirements for bed and breakfast establishments regarding food, beverages, and fire safety
Title
Provide requirements for bed and breakfast establishments regarding food, beverages, and fire safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-03-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 14, 2023 |
2023-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |