NE LB546 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB546 amended into LB390 by AM1651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB546 amended into LB390 by AM1651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize administration of naloxone as prescribed
Title
Authorize administration of naloxone as prescribed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB546 amended into LB390 by AM1651 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2015-05-28 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2015-03-26 | Legislature | Garrett name added |
2015-03-24 | Legislature | Judiciary AM567 filed |
2015-03-24 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM567 |
2015-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 06, 2015 |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |