NE LB543 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to applications and reporting requirements under the Nebraska Advantage Act
Title
Change provisions relating to applications and reporting requirements under the Nebraska Advantage Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-03-02 | Legislature | Legislative Performance Audit priority bill |
2017-03-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 15, 2017 |
2017-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2017-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31677 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB543.pdf |