NE LB543 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change a penalty from death to life imprisonment or life imprisonment without possibility of parole
Title
Change a penalty from death to life imprisonment or life imprisonment without possibility of parole
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill. |
2013-05-14 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh AM1339 filed |
2013-05-14 | Legislature | Chambers MO73 failed |
2013-05-14 | Legislature | Chambers MO73 Invoke cloture filed |
2013-05-14 | Legislature | Ashford AM1380 pending |
2013-05-14 | Legislature | Chambers MO72 withdrawn |
2013-05-14 | Legislature | Chambers MO72 Bracket until May 21, 2013 filed |
2013-05-13 | Legislature | Ashford AM1380 filed |
2013-05-13 | Legislature | Coash AM1367 pending |
2013-05-13 | Legislature | Carlson FA77 withdrawn |
2013-05-13 | Legislature | Chambers MO71 prevailed |
2013-05-13 | Legislature | Chambers MO71 Reconsider the vote taken on FA77 filed |
2013-05-13 | Legislature | Carlson FA77 adopted |
2013-05-13 | Legislature | Carlson FA77 filed |
2013-05-13 | Legislature | Coash AM1367 pending |
2013-05-13 | Legislature | Ashford MO68 failed |
2013-05-13 | Legislature | Ashford MO68 pending |
2013-05-13 | Legislature | Ashford MO68 pending |
2013-05-13 | Legislature | Ashford MO68 Bracket until June 5, 2013 filed |
2013-05-13 | Legislature | McCoy MO67 withdrawn |
2013-05-13 | Legislature | McCoy MO67 reoffered |
2013-05-13 | Legislature | Coash AM1366 filed |
2013-05-13 | Legislature | Coash AM1369 filed |
2013-05-13 | Legislature | Coash AM1367 filed |
2013-05-13 | Legislature | Coash AM865 divided |
2013-05-13 | Legislature | McCoy MO67 withdrawn |
2013-05-13 | Legislature | McCoy MO67 Bracket until June 5, 2013 filed |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Coash AM865 filed |
2013-03-20 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2013-03-20 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2013-03-14 | Legislature | Chambers priority bill |
2013-03-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 13, 2013 |
2013-01-24 | Legislature | McGill name added |
2013-01-24 | Legislature | Ashford name added |
2013-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2013-01-23 | Legislature | Coash name added |
2013-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=18845 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB543.pdf |