NE LB542 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the issuance of highway bonds under the Nebraska Highway Bond Act
Title
Authorize the issuance of highway bonds under the Nebraska Highway Bond Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lynne Walz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-05-12 | Legislature | Passed over |
2021-03-31 | Legislature | Revenue AM401 filed |
2021-03-31 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM401 |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Walz priority bill |
2021-02-18 | Legislature | Kolterman name added |
2021-02-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 03, 2021 |
2021-02-08 | Legislature | Moser name added |
2021-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |