NE LB542 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for liens and recovery of debt incurred under the Medical Assistance Act
Title
Provide for liens and recovery of debt incurred under the Medical Assistance Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Kuehn [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2017 |
2017-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=30884 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB542.pdf |