NE LB541 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Approved by Governor on February 19, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Approved by Governor on February 19, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions related to the bone marrow registry
Title
Change provisions related to the bone marrow registry
Sponsors
Sen. Lynne Walz [N] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM950 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM950 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 19, 2020 |
2020-02-13 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 13, 2020 |
2020-02-13 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-02-13 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2020-02-11 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER158 adopted |
2020-01-30 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER158 filed |
2020-01-30 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER158 |
2020-01-29 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-01-29 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM950 adopted |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-04-02 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM950 filed |
2019-04-02 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM950 |
2019-02-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 13, 2019 |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |