NE LB540 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Notice of hearing for March 24, 2023
Pending: Legislature Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Notice of hearing for March 24, 2023
Pending: Legislature Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to public lettings
Title
Change provisions relating to public lettings
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 24, 2023 |
2023-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |