NE LB54 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change immunity for intentional torts under the Political Subdivisions Tort Claims Act and the State Tort Claims Act
Title
Change immunity for intentional torts under the Political Subdivisions Tort Claims Act and the State Tort Claims Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Legislature - Judiciary AM1268 adopted (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Legislature - Judiciary AM1268 adopted (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER94 filed |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER94 |
2021-05-11 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-05-11 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1268 adopted |
2021-05-10 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1268 filed |
2021-05-10 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1268 |
2021-03-12 | Legislature | Lathrop priority bill |
2021-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 18, 2021 |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |