NE LB54 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Halloran name added
Pending: Legislature Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to carrying a concealed weapon

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to carrying a concealed weapon

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27LegislatureHalloran name added
2019-02-11LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 28, 2019
2019-01-31LegislatureErdman name added
2019-01-14LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2019-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback