NE LB539 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change the Office of Inspector General of the Nebraska Correctional System Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change the Office of Inspector General of the Nebraska Correctional System Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 42-2-5 (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 42-2-5 (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 27, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 24, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-04-24LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 42-2-5
2017-04-10LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2017-04-03LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-04-03LegislatureKrist AM817 adopted
2017-04-03LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER28 adopted
2017-03-30LegislatureKrist AM817 filed
2017-03-29LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER28 filed
2017-03-29LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER28
2017-03-28LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-03-28LegislatureEbke AM748 adopted
2017-03-28LegislatureEbke AM748 filed
2017-03-28LegislatureChambers AM649 adopted
2017-03-28LegislatureChambers AM649 filed
2017-03-06LegislatureExecutive Board priority bill
2017-02-14LegislaturePlaced on General File
2017-01-27LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 08, 2017
2017-01-20LegislatureReferred to Executive Board
2017-01-18LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback