NE LB535 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit employment discrimination by qualified businesses under the Nebraska Advantage Act
Title
Prohibit employment discrimination by qualified businesses under the Nebraska Advantage Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks name added |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2019-03-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 15, 2019 |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37632 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB535.pdf |