NE LB534 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Approved by Governor on August 17, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Approved by Governor on August 17, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Require public postsecondary educational institutions to submit reports regarding sexual harassment and require public hearings as prescribed
Title
Require public postsecondary educational institutions to submit reports regarding sexual harassment and require public hearings as prescribed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 41-1-7 (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-24 - Legislature - Cavanaugh AM3160 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-07-24 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Legislature - Cavanaugh AM2053 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Legislature - Education AM686 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-24 - Legislature - Cavanaugh AM3160 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-07-24 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Legislature - Cavanaugh AM2053 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Legislature - Education AM686 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 17, 2020 |
2020-08-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on August 12, 2020 |
2020-08-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-08-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 41-1-7 |
2020-07-27 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading Second |
2020-07-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment |
2020-07-24 | Legislature | Cavanaugh AM3160 adopted |
2020-07-24 | Legislature | Cavanaugh AM3160 filed |
2020-07-24 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2020-07-24 | Legislature | Cavanaugh AM2996 withdrawn |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Cavanaugh AM2996 filed |
2020-02-04 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-01-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-01-31 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER153 adopted |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER153 filed |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER153 |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Cavanaugh AM2053 adopted |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Education AM686 adopted |
2020-01-16 | Legislature | Howard name added |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Cavanaugh AM2053 filed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-03-14 | Legislature | Education AM686 filed |
2019-03-14 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM686 |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 05, 2019 |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |