NE LB530 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change requirements for providing information to the Legislative Fiscal Analyst and provide for withholding appropriations
Title
Change requirements for providing information to the Legislative Fiscal Analyst and provide for withholding appropriations
Sponsors
Sen. Burke Harr [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2017-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2017 |
2017-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2017-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31711 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB530.pdf |