NE LB519 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate certification fees for teaching certificates, create and terminate funds, state intent regarding an appropriation for school employees, change provisions of the Excellence in Teaching Act, and adopt the Student Teaching Assistance Act
Title
Eliminate certification fees for teaching certificates, create and terminate funds, state intent regarding an appropriation for school employees, change provisions of the Excellence in Teaching Act, and adopt the Student Teaching Assistance Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lynne Walz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB519 amended into LB705 by AM1681 |
2023-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2023 |
2023-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |