NE LB519 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB517 amended into LB519 by AM1460
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB517 amended into LB519 by AM1460
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change civil and criminal provisions relating to certain sexual offenses, human trafficking, and child abuse
Title
Change civil and criminal provisions relating to certain sexual offenses, human trafficking, and child abuse
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Slama [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Legislature - Chambers FA69 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Legislature - Wishart AM1591 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Legislature - Lathrop AM1602 adopted (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Legislature - Judiciary AM1460 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Legislature - Chambers FA69 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Legislature - Wishart AM1591 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Legislature - Lathrop AM1602 adopted (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Legislature - Judiciary AM1460 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB517 amended into LB519 by AM1460 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB516 amended into LB519 by AM1460 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB479 amended into LB519 by AM1591 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Chambers FA88 withdrawn |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Chambers FA88 filed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER129 adopted |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER129 filed |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER129 |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Chambers FA69 adopted |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Wishart AM1591 adopted |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Lathrop AM1602 adopted |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1460 adopted |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Chambers FA69 filed |
2019-05-09 | Legislature | Wishart AM1591 filed |
2019-05-07 | Legislature | Lathrop AM1602 filed |
2019-04-30 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1460 filed |
2019-04-30 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1460 |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | State-Tribal Relations priority bill |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Bostelman name added |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 13, 2019 |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |