NE LB519 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Approved by Governor on May 22, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change Employment Security Law provisions relating to employers' experience and reimbursement accounts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change Employment Security Law provisions relating to employers' experience and reimbursement accounts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-16 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureApproved by Governor on May 22, 2017
2017-05-17LegislaturePresented to Governor on May 16, 2017
2017-05-16LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-05-16LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 46-0-3
2017-05-08LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading Second
2017-05-04LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment
2017-05-04LegislatureHansen AM1320 adopted
2017-05-04LegislatureHansen AM1320 filed
2017-05-04LegislatureReturned to Select File for specific amendment
2017-05-02LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2017-04-26LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-04-26LegislatureHansen AM1187 adopted
2017-04-25LegislatureHansen AM1187 filed
2017-04-24LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2017-04-20LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-02-02LegislaturePlaced on General File
2017-01-20LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 30, 2017
2017-01-20LegislatureReferred to Business and Labor Committee
2017-01-18LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback