NE LB518A | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-12 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-12 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Linehan [N] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-12 - Legislature - Blood MO226 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-12 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-08-12 | Legislature | Blood MO226 prevailed |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Blood MO226 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2020-02-18 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2020-02-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-02-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2020-02-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |