NE LB518 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Rural Workforce Housing Investment Act and transfer funds from the Affordable Housing Trust Fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Rural Workforce Housing Investment Act and transfer funds from the Affordable Housing Trust Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 27, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 24, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-04-24LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 49-0-0
2017-04-05LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2017-04-03LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-04-03LegislatureWilliams AM687 adopted
2017-04-03LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER23 adopted
2017-03-29LegislatureWilliams AM687 filed
2017-03-23LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER23 filed
2017-03-23LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER23
2017-03-22LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-03-22LegislatureBolz AM716 adopted
2017-03-22LegislatureBusiness and Labor AM424 adopted
2017-03-21LegislatureBolz AM716 filed
2017-03-09LegislatureBriese name added
2017-03-03LegislatureBusiness and Labor AM424 filed
2017-03-03LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM424
2017-03-03LegislatureBusiness and Labor priority bill
2017-02-02LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 13, 2017
2017-01-20LegislatureReferred to Business and Labor Committee
2017-01-18LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback