NE LB516 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB516 amended into LB670 by AM2093
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to a report on juvenile facilities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to a report on juvenile facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB516 amended into LB670 by AM2093
2018-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2018-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2017-04-04LegislatureJudiciary AM562 filed
2017-04-04LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM562
2017-02-01LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 09, 2017
2017-02-01LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 08, 2017 (cancel)
2017-01-30LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 08, 2017
2017-01-20LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2017-01-18LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback