NE LB514 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change procedures for forming a new political party under the Election Act
Title
Change procedures for forming a new political party under the Election Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB514 amended into LB285 by AM1300 |
2021-02-16 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2021 |
2021-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |