NE LB513 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB513 amended into LB287 by AM2060
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB513 amended into LB287 by AM2060
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change proof of publication requirements for legal notices and requirements for published notice and virtual conferencing under the Open Meetings Act
Title
Change proof of publication requirements for legal notices and requirements for published notice and virtual conferencing under the Open Meetings Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB513 amended into LB287 by AM2060 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-03-09 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2023-02-16 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2023-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2023 |
2023-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |