NE LB512 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Critical Infrastructure Utility Worker Protection Act
Title
Adopt the Critical Infrastructure Utility Worker Protection Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-03-24 | Legislature | Brewer AM2357 filed |
2022-03-17 | Legislature | Brewer AM2387 filed |
2022-02-22 | Legislature | Business and Labor priority bill |
2022-02-15 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM1620 filed |
2022-02-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1620 |
2022-02-02 | Legislature | Brewer AM1620 filed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-02-24 | Legislature | Gragert name added |
2021-02-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 01, 2021 |
2021-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |