NE LB51 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB601 amended into LB51 by AM745
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB601 amended into LB51 by AM745
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to qualifications, training, certification, accreditation, powers, and duties of certain law enforcement personnel
Title
Change provisions relating to qualifications, training, certification, accreditation, powers, and duties of certain law enforcement personnel
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 41-1-7 (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Legislature - Brewer AM1292 adopted (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Legislature - Brewer AM1249 adopted (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Legislature - Judiciary AM745 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Legislature - Flood AM872 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Legislature - Brewer AM1292 adopted (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Legislature - Brewer AM1249 adopted (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Legislature - Judiciary AM745 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Legislature - Flood AM872 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB601 amended into LB51 by AM745 |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 41-1-7 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST21 |
2021-05-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-05-10 | Legislature | Brewer AM1292 adopted |
2021-05-10 | Legislature | Brewer AM1249 adopted |
2021-05-10 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER67 adopted |
2021-05-06 | Legislature | Brewer AM1292 filed |
2021-05-05 | Legislature | Brewer AM1249 filed |
2021-04-26 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER67 filed |
2021-04-26 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER67 |
2021-04-23 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2021-04-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-04-21 | Legislature | Judiciary AM745 adopted |
2021-04-21 | Legislature | Flood AM872 adopted |
2021-04-21 | Legislature | Hunt MO40 withdrawn |
2021-04-21 | Legislature | Hunt MO40 Bracket bill until May 1, 2021 filed |
2021-04-09 | Legislature | DeBoer name added |
2021-04-06 | Legislature | Flood AM872 filed |
2021-03-31 | Legislature | Judiciary AM745 filed |
2021-03-31 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM745 |
2021-03-12 | Legislature | Judiciary priority bill |
2021-02-04 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks name added |
2021-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2021 |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |