NE LB51 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change license applications, prohibited acts, and franchise restrictions under the Motor Vehicle Industry Regulation Act
Title
Change license applications, prohibited acts, and franchise restrictions under the Motor Vehicle Industry Regulation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-01-31 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2019-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 26, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37078 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB51.pdf |