NE LB51 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to sales of real property for nonpayment of taxes
Title
Change provisions relating to sales of real property for nonpayment of taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-02-12 | Legislature | Schumacher AM1736 filed |
2018-02-01 | Legislature | Chambers MO199 failed |
2018-02-01 | Legislature | Chambers MO199 Unbracket the bill filed |
2018-02-01 | Legislature | Chambers MO197 prevailed |
2018-02-01 | Legislature | Chambers MO197 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed |
2018-02-01 | Legislature | Schumacher MO196 pending |
2018-02-01 | Legislature | Schumacher MO196 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2018-01-31 | Legislature | Revenue AM267 adopted |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-03-15 | Legislature | Revenue AM267 filed |
2017-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM267 |
2017-01-12 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 19, 2017 |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2017-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31065 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB51.pdf |