NE LB509 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Approved by Governor on May 09, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Approved by Governor on May 09, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change and eliminate provisions relating to subpoenas, witness fees, and compulsory process as prescribed
Title
Change and eliminate provisions relating to subpoenas, witness fees, and compulsory process as prescribed
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Ebke [N] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 09, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 03, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2017-04-21 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2017-04-19 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-04-19 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER54 adopted |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER54 filed |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER54 |
2017-04-05 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-04-05 | Legislature | Judiciary AM357 adopted |
2017-03-13 | Legislature | Judiciary AM357 filed |
2017-03-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM357 |
2017-03-13 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2017-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2017 |
2017-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |