NE LB505 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB505 amended into LB727 by AM1396
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for motor vehicle registration of plug-in hybrid electric vehicles, impose an excise tax on electric energy used at commercial electric vehicle charging stations, provide for regulation of commercial electric vehicle charging stations, and provide a sales tax exemption for certain electric energy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for motor vehicle registration of plug-in hybrid electric vehicles, impose an excise tax on electric energy used at commercial electric vehicle charging stations, provide for regulation of commercial electric vehicle charging stations, and provide a sales tax exemption for certain electric energy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-01LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB505 amended into LB727 by AM1396
2023-06-01LegislatureIndefinitely Postponed
2023-05-30LegislatureRevenue AM1971 filed
2023-05-30LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM1971
2023-03-01LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 08, 2023
2023-01-19LegislatureReferred to Revenue Committee
2023-01-17LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback