NE LB500 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Approved by Governor on May 5, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Approved by Governor on May 5, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide venue for prosecution of offenses committed using an electronic communication device
Title
Provide venue for prosecution of offenses committed using an electronic communication device
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Legislature - Judiciary AM633 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Legislature - Judiciary AM633 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 5, 2021 |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 29, 2021 |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2021-04-15 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER42 adopted |
2021-03-31 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER42 filed |
2021-03-31 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER42 |
2021-03-30 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-03-30 | Legislature | Geist AM528 withdrawn |
2021-03-30 | Legislature | Judiciary AM633 adopted |
2021-03-17 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2021-03-12 | Legislature | Judiciary AM633 filed |
2021-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM633 |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Geist AM528 filed |
2021-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 17, 2021 |
2021-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |