NE LB5 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for compensability under Nebraska Workers’ Compensation Act for mental injuries resulting from workplace violence

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for compensability under Nebraska Workers’ Compensation Act for mental injuries resulting from workplace violence

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2023-05-23LegislatureHunt AM1931 filed
2023-05-23LegislatureHunt AM1930 filed
2023-03-14LegislatureBlood AM476 filed
2023-02-02LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 13, 2023
2023-01-30LegislatureHunt name added
2023-01-10LegislatureWishart name added
2023-01-10LegislatureConrad name added
2023-01-10LegislatureMcDonnell name added
2023-01-10LegislatureBostar name added
2023-01-10LegislatureAguilar name added
2023-01-09LegislatureReferred to Business and Labor Committee
2023-01-05LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback