NE LB492 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Nebraska Integrated Juvenile Data Governing Body and the Nebraska Juvenile Justice Information System
Title
Create the Nebraska Integrated Juvenile Data Governing Body and the Nebraska Juvenile Justice Information System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2021 |
2021-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |