NE LB492 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor on May 12, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Self-Service Storage Facilities Act and authorize certain liens

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Self-Service Storage Facilities Act and authorize certain liens

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15LegislatureApproved by Governor on May 12, 2017
2017-05-09LegislaturePresented to Governor on May 08, 2017
2017-05-08LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-05-08LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 47-0-2
2017-05-08LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2017-05-03LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST26
2017-05-02LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-05-02LegislatureHarr AM1234 adopted
2017-05-02LegislatureHarr AM1218 withdrawn
2017-04-27LegislatureHarr AM1234 filed
2017-04-26LegislatureHarr AM1218 filed
2017-04-25LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2017-04-20LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-04-20LegislatureJudiciary AM310 adopted
2017-03-01LegislatureJudiciary AM310 filed
2017-03-01LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM310
2017-01-30LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 15, 2017
2017-01-19LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2017-01-17LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback