NE LB486 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Wayne explanation of vote
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change continuing education requirements for insurance licensees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change continuing education requirements for insurance licensees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01LegislatureWayne explanation of vote
2018-02-28LegislatureApproved by Governor on February 28, 2018
2018-02-26LegislaturePresented to Governor on February 23, 2018
2018-02-23LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2018-02-23LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 46-0-3
2018-02-20LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2018-02-14LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2018-02-14LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER100 adopted
2018-01-24LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER100 filed
2018-01-24LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER100
2018-01-22LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2018-01-22LegislatureBanking, Commerce and Insurance AM208 adopted
2018-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2017-03-08LegislatureBanking, Commerce and Insurance AM208 filed
2017-03-08LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM208
2017-01-23LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 31, 2017
2017-01-19LegislatureReferred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
2017-01-17LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback