NE LB485 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create Chief Standing Bear and Indigenous Leaders' Day

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create Chief Standing Bear and Indigenous Leaders' Day

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2018-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2017-02-22LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 23, 2017
2017-01-19LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2017-01-17LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback