NE LB481 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB642 amended into LB481 by AM1815
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB642 amended into LB481 by AM1815
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Brain Injury Trust Fund Act and change provisions related to the Nebraska Health Care Cash Fund
Title
Adopt the Brain Injury Trust Fund Act and change provisions related to the Nebraska Health Care Cash Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Bolz [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 41-1-7 (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Appropriations AM1815 adopted (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Hansen, M. MO99 prevailed (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Appropriations AM1815 lost (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Appropriations AM1815 adopted (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Hansen, M. MO99 prevailed (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Appropriations AM1815 lost (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB642 amended into LB481 by AM1815 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 41-1-7 |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER131 adopted |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER131 filed |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER131 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | McDonnell name added |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Stinner AM1125 withdrawn |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Bolz AM614 withdrawn |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Appropriations AM1815 adopted |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Hansen, M. MO99 prevailed |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Hansen, M. MO99 Reconsider the vote taken on AM1815 filed |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Appropriations AM1815 lost |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Appropriations AM1815 filed |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1815 |
2019-04-02 | Legislature | Stinner AM1125 filed |
2019-03-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 28, 2019, on AM614 |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | Scheer priority bill |
2019-03-06 | Legislature | Bolz AM614 filed |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 12, 2019 |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |