NE LB479 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer the Office of Probation Administration to the executive branch, rename the Division of Parole Supervision as the Parole Supervision Agency, and remove such agency from the Board of Parole
Title
Transfer the Office of Probation Administration to the executive branch, rename the Division of Parole Supervision as the Parole Supervision Agency, and remove such agency from the Board of Parole
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-02-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 02, 2023 |
2023-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |