NE LB478 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by Governor on May 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by Governor on May 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit evidence of a minor's consent in any civil proceeding involving certain alleged sex offenses
Title
Prohibit evidence of a minor's consent in any civil proceeding involving certain alleged sex offenses
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Legislature - Vargas AM1507 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Legislature - Judiciary AM1216 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Legislature - Vargas AM1507 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Legislature - Judiciary AM1216 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 13, 2019 |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 |
2019-05-07 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Vargas AM1507 adopted |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER94 adopted |
2019-05-01 | Legislature | Vargas AM1507 filed |
2019-04-30 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER94 filed |
2019-04-30 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER94 |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1216 adopted |
2019-04-15 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1216 filed |
2019-04-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1216 |
2019-03-20 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 13, 2019 |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |