NE LB475 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require an opinion from the Attorney General with respect to whether an initiative measure contains more than one subject
Title
Require an opinion from the Attorney General with respect to whether an initiative measure contains more than one subject
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-02-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 18, 2021 |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |