NE LB468 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide compensation by the Game and Parks Commission for property damage caused by wildlife
Title
Provide compensation by the Game and Parks Commission for property damage caused by wildlife
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2021 |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |