NE LB462 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB617 amended into LB462 by AM1568
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB617 amended into LB462 by AM1568
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the One-Call Notification System Act and the Nebraska Telecommunications Regulation Act
Title
Change provisions of the One-Call Notification System Act and the Nebraska Telecommunications Regulation Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Legislature - Friesen AM1909 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Legislature - Hilgers AM1837 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Legislature - Friesen AM1736 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Legislature - Transportation and Telecommunications AM1568 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Legislature - Friesen AM1909 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Legislature - Hilgers AM1837 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Legislature - Friesen AM1736 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Legislature - Transportation and Telecommunications AM1568 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB617 amended into LB462 by AM1568 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Friesen AM1909 adopted |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Cavanaugh MO103 withdrawn |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Cavanaugh MO103 Recommit to the Transportation and Telecommunications Committee filed |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER127 adopted |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Friesen AM1909 filed |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER127 filed |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER127 |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Hilgers AM1837 adopted |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Hilgers AM1837 filed |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Friesen AM1736 adopted |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Friesen AM1670 withdrawn |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM1568 adopted |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Wayne MO34 withdrawn |
2019-05-09 | Legislature | Friesen AM1736 filed |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Friesen AM1670 filed |
2019-05-01 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM1568 filed |
2019-05-01 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1568 |
2019-03-27 | Legislature | Wayne MO34 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications priority bill |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Albrecht name added |
2019-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2019 |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |