NE LB461 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Approved by Governor on February 13, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Approved by Governor on February 13, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change, transfer, and eliminate provisions relating to the materiel division of the Department of Administrative Services and procurement of services and personal property
Title
Change, transfer, and eliminate provisions relating to the materiel division of the Department of Administrative Services and procurement of services and personal property
Sponsors
Sen. John Arch [N] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM389 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM389 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 13, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 8, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2024-02-01 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2024-01-30 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-01-30 | Legislature | Wayne AM2245 withdrawn |
2024-01-30 | Legislature | Wayne AM2245 to ER39 filed |
2024-01-30 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER39 adopted |
2024-01-26 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER39 filed |
2024-01-26 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER39 |
2024-01-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-01-22 | Legislature | Hunt AM1067 not considered |
2024-01-22 | Legislature | Hunt AM1065 not considered |
2024-01-22 | Legislature | Erdman MO1173 withdrawn |
2024-01-22 | Legislature | Erdman MO1173 Pass over LB461 pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(d) filed |
2024-01-22 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM389 adopted |
2024-01-22 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO591 withdrawn |
2024-01-22 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO590 withdrawn |
2024-01-22 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO589 withdrawn |
2024-01-22 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO588 withdrawn |
2024-01-22 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO587 withdrawn |
2024-01-22 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO586 withdrawn |
2024-01-22 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO585 withdrawn |
2024-01-05 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. name added |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Arch priority bill |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO590 Bracket until June 2, 2023 filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO587 Bracket until June 1, 2023 filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO591 Recommit to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO589 Recommit to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO586 Recommit to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO588 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO585 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6 Section 3(f) filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt AM1067 filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt AM1065 filed |
2023-02-24 | Legislature | Arch priority bill |
2023-02-24 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM389 filed |
2023-02-24 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM389 |
2023-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2023 |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2023-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |