NE LB46 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate an alternative service provision under the Uniform Residential Landlord and Tenant Act
Title
Eliminate an alternative service provision under the Uniform Residential Landlord and Tenant Act
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB46 amended into LB320 by AM450 |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2021 |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |