NE LB457 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB457 amended into LB1150 by AM2236
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB457 amended into LB1150 by AM2236
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to deductions for certain sales and use tax refunds
Title
Change provisions relating to deductions for certain sales and use tax refunds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB457 amended into LB1150 by AM2236 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-02-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 24, 2021 |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |