NE LB457 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Define and redefine terms relating to industrial hemp under the Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Title
Define and redefine terms relating to industrial hemp under the Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2019 |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37715 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB457.pdf |