NE LB452 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB452 amended into LB376 by AM472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to microdistilleries under the Nebraska Liquor Control Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to microdistilleries under the Nebraska Liquor Control Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-01LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB452 amended into LB376 by AM472
2023-06-01LegislatureIndefinitely Postponed
2023-03-07LegislatureGeneral Affairs AM710 filed
2023-03-07LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM710
2023-01-25LegislatureMurman AM65 filed
2023-01-23LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 30, 2023
2023-01-18LegislatureReferred to General Affairs Committee
2023-01-13LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback