NE LB451 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB314 amended into LB451 by AM1137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB314 amended into LB451 by AM1137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change various provisions relating to elections as prescribed
Title
Change various provisions relating to elections as prescribed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB314 amended into LB451 by AM1137 |
2017-05-15 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 12, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 08, 2017 |
2017-05-08 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-05-08 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2017-05-08 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Murante AM1244 adopted |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER80 adopted |
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Murante AM1244 filed |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER80 filed |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER80 |
2017-04-25 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-04-25 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1137 adopted |
2017-04-25 | Legislature | Murante AM1192 adopted |
2017-04-25 | Legislature | Murante AM1192 filed |
2017-04-25 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1137 pending |
2017-04-21 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1137 filed |
2017-04-21 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1137 |
2017-03-09 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs priority bill |
2017-02-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 01, 2017 |
2017-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |