NE LB450A | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Approved by Governor on August 17, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Approved by Governor on August 17, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-13 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Legislature - Wishart AM3355 adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Legislature - Wishart AM3355 adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 17, 2020 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on August 13, 2020 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading Second with ST76 |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Wishart AM3355 adopted |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Wishart AM3355 filed |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Wishart AM2057 withdrawn |
2020-01-09 | Legislature | Wishart AM2057 filed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-03-05 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-02-12 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |