NE LB446 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB446 amended into LB1073 by AM3285
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Peer-to-Peer Vehicle Sharing Program Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Peer-to-Peer Vehicle Sharing Program Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-25LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB446 amended into LB1073 by AM3285
2024-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2024-03-14LegislatureBanking, Commerce and Insurance AM366 filed
2024-03-14LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM366
2024-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2023-05-23LegislatureHunt AM1877 filed
2023-05-23LegislatureHunt AM1876 filed
2023-01-23LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 13, 2023
2023-01-18LegislatureReferred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
2023-01-13LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback