NE LB445 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-26 - Notice of hearing for February 05, 2021
Pending: Legislature Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change requirements for peace officers taking juveniles into custody or interrogating juveniles and prohibit use of statements taken in violation of such requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change requirements for peace officers taking juveniles into custody or interrogating juveniles and prohibit use of statements taken in violation of such requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-26LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 05, 2021
2021-01-20LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-01-15LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback